U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00039
  • Case Name: OREGONIANS FOR FLOODPLAIN PROTECTION v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Receipt and Acknowledgment of Transfer Papers]
  • March 28, 2025: [Case Transferred Out]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Transfer Case]
  • March 11, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 10, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
February, 2025
  • February 21, 2025: [Response to motion]
January, 2025
  • January 10, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.