U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00091
  • Case Name: NORWICH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. v. BECERRA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 22, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 18, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit]
  • April 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • April 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2025: [Sealed Memorandum Opinion]
  • April 17, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 08, 2025: [Sealed Document]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • March 28, 2025: [Joint Appendix]
  • March 27, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • March 27, 2025: [Sealed Opposition]
  • March 27, 2025: [Sealed Reply]
  • March 26, 2025: [Sealed Reply]
  • March 26, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • March 26, 2025: [Sealed Opposition]
  • March 26, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • March 26, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 19, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
January, 2025
  • January 18, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.