U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00021-
  • Case Name: Parlor Restaurant and Lounge, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Amended Application to Employ]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Operating Report]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Discharge Order to Show Cause (Case Admin)]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Response]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Operating Report]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Declaration]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Amended Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Amended List of Creditors/Schedules: Adding, Deleting, Changes to Debt Amount/Reclassification]
  • March 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Order To Show Cause]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Dismiss Case]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Convert Case to 7]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Declaration]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [List of Creditors]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Amended Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Continue Hearing]
January, 2025
  • January 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Metz, Stephen A. [Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee]
  • January 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.