U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00028-
  • Case Name: DeWayne E. Harper
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Discharge Order to Show Cause (Case Admin)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Receipt of Final Installment Payment]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Hearing - Held (BK)]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order To Show Cause Failure To Pay Installments]
January, 2025
  • January 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.