U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00239
  • Case Name: NATIONAL COUNCIL OF NONPROFITS et al v. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Case Stayed]
  • May 13, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines]
  • May 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 12, 2025: [.Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [Status Report]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 25, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit]
  • April 24, 2025: [Status Report Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • March 10, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
February, 2025
  • February 01, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
January, 2025
  • January 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.