U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-10023-
  • Case Name: Developer RE1 LLC et al v. WCP Fund I LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 19, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 18, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Opposition]
  • April 17, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order on Generic Motion ]
  • April 16, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Generic (USE ONLY IF NO OTHER EVENT MATCHES)]
  • April 03, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 02, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Returned Mail]
  • April 01, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing - Continued (by Order)]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • March 25, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Remand]
  • March 19, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • March 19, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 19, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • March 18, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 17, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • March 16, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Draft Summons]
January, 2025
  • January 28, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order - Generic]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.