U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00017-
  • Case Name: Fazli Yurter Ozcan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Examination]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Compel]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Examination]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Compel]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Complaint]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Response]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Examination]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Examination]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Trustee's Report of Sale]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Examination]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under 11 U.S.C. Section 363(f)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Employ]
  • March 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions]
January, 2025
  • January 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.