U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00076
  • Case Name: ESMAEILZADEH et al v. BLINKEN et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • May 02, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 14, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2025
  • February 02, 2025: [Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge for All Purposes]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.