U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00027-
  • Case Name: Jacqueline Crawford
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Receipt of Final Installment Payment]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • March 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
February, 2025
  • February 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order To Show Cause Failure To Pay Installments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.