U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00234
  • Case Name: DOE et al v. OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 07, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: [Certify Class]
  • April 27, 2025: [Discovery]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • March 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 12, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • March 12, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
February, 2025
  • February 07, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • February 04, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.