U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00419-
  • Case Name: Celestine Sonatal Elliott
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Relief from Stay]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Objection to Confirmation of the Plan]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order for Relief]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Borrow]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Pre-Confirmation Certificate]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Pre-Confirmation Certificate]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Relief from Stay]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing Notice - Hearing Continued - Trustee]
February, 2025
  • February 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Request to Withdraw Document]
  • February 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.