U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00048-
  • Case Name: Drenika Renee Wilson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Certificate of Debtor Education]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
February, 2025
  • February 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Receipt of Final Installment Payment]
  • February 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.