U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00039-
  • Case Name: Diane Louisa McCown
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order Approving Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (BK)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (BK)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
February, 2025
  • February 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Receipt of Final Installment Payment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.