U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00016-
  • Case Name: Remeaka Jones
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Receipt of Final Installment Payment]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Discharge Order to Show Cause (Case Admin)]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order To Show Cause Failure To Pay Installments]
February, 2025
  • February 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.