U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00352
  • Case Name: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES et al v. TRUMP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 25, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 07, 2025: [Administrative Record]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 13, 2025: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 11, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 11, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 11, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Expedite]
  • March 10, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2025
  • February 09, 2025: [Transcript]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.