U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03337
  • Case Name: BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY v. JOHNSON et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • May 05, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 02, 2025: [Joint Appendix]
  • May 02, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 09, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 08, 2025: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 01, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • March 24, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • March 20, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 17, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2025
  • February 11, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.