U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00339
  • Case Name: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF LABOR AND CONGRESS OF INDUSTRIAL ORGANIZATIONS et al v. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 18, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 16, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 10, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 10, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 31, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 29, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 20, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • March 19, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 19, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 18, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 16, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 15, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 14, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Discovery]
  • March 13, 2025: [Sealed Opposition]
  • March 13, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • March 11, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • March 11, 2025: [Protective Order]
February, 2025
  • February 26, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • February 11, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.