U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10001-
  • Case Name: Cracked Eggery Inc v. Patterson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Objection]
  • April 16, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • April 16, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 27, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • March 14, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing - Continued (AP)]
February, 2025
  • February 12, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.