U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00054-
  • Case Name: Sherry Yvette Richardson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Discharge Order to Show Cause (Case Admin)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Response]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order To Show Cause]
March, 2025
  • March 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Certificate of Debtor Education (Original or Amended)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Amended List of Creditors/Schedules: Change EXISTING Name/Address]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Amended Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Amended Voluntary Petition]
February, 2025
  • February 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Service - Ntc of Requirement to File Stmt of Completion of Mgmt Course]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.