U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00391-
  • Case Name: Kimberly Bianca Battle
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 7 No Asset (Discharged)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Discharge Order to Show Cause (Case Admin)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Certificate of Debtor Education (Original or Amended)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Receipt of Final Installment Payment]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
February, 2025
  • February 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.