U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00058
  • Case Name: Esther Laree Boykin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Certificate of Debtor Education]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
February, 2025
  • February 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.