U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00447
  • Case Name: SMITH v. FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 04, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 02, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • March 21, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
February, 2025
  • February 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.