U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00429
  • Case Name: STATE OF NEW MEXICO et al v. MUSK et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 12, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 06, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • May 06, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • May 06, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • May 05, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • May 02, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 08, 2025: [Vacate]
  • April 08, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • March 31, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 28, 2025: [USCA Order (No Link)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 22, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • March 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2025: [Remark- Consolidation]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 17, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 17, 2025: [Leave to File Denied]
  • March 14, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 12, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2025
  • February 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.