U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00034-
  • Case Name: Paradigm Chiropractic and Performance, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Opposition]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Order Discharging Chapter 13 Trustee]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Ch. 11 Subch V Case Trustee's Report of NoDistribution B-case dism or conv, fee award recd]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Disgorge Fees]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Compensation]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [BNC Certificate of Service - Notice of Filing of Transcript]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Transcript]
  • March 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Notice - Generic]
February, 2025
  • February 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • February 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.