U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00306
  • Case Name: REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES et al v. NOEM et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • May 06, 2025: [Supplemental Memorandum]
  • May 06, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • May 02, 2025: [Transcript]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 29, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • March 28, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 28, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • March 24, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • March 14, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2025
  • February 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.