U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00063-
  • Case Name: 1521 V St SE, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Discharge Order to Show Cause (Case Admin)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors Continued (TRUSTEE ONLY 341 Filings)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Response]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order To Show Cause]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order for Relief]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice - Generic]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Hearing - Scheduled (by Order) BK]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Relief from Stay]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
March, 2025
  • March 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Service - Ntc of Requirement to File Stmt of Completion of Mgmt Course]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order Discharge Order to Show Cause (Judge)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice Of Requirement To File A Certificate of Debtor Education]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order Converting Case From Ch 11 To Ch 7]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Witness and Exhibit List]
  • March 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Scheduled (by Order) BK]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Appoint Trustee]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
February, 2025
  • February 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims (Original or Amended)]
  • February 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.