U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00538
  • Case Name: SHNAIDER et al v. AL JAZEERA MEDIA NETWORK et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • May 09, 2025: [Briefing Schedule]
  • May 09, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 03, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
February, 2025
  • February 23, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.