U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00164
  • Case Name: PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. et al v. TRUMP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 13, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 22, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • March 19, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule]
  • March 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 13, 2025: [Briefing Schedule]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2025
  • February 23, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.