U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00022-
  • Case Name: Kenyon Sherman LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Employ]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Opposition]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Failure to Prosecute]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Convert Case to 7]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Application to Employ]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury - Form 202]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule A/B]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Opportunity to Object (Correction)]
February, 2025
  • February 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.