U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00465
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF CATHOLIC BISHOPS v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • May 05, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 08, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 08, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 08, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 17, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Injunction]
  • March 13, 2025: [Injunction]
  • March 13, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
  • March 11, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2025
  • February 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.