U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03283
  • Case Name: HOAG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL PRESBYTERIAN v. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • March 10, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 10, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
February, 2025
  • February 25, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.