U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00067-
  • Case Name: Vincent Larry Phillips
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Receipt re Notice of Appeal]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Dismiss Case]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Barring Debtor]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims (Original or Amended)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule G]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule C]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule J]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule I]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule H]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule E/F]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule D]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule A/B]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Original or Amended)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Response]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement Adjourning (Continuing) Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Appearance (Attorney)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order To Show Cause]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
February, 2025
  • February 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.