U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00072
  • Case Name: REMC LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Dismiss Case]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Convert Case to 7]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement Adjourning (Continuing) Meeting of Creditors]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice - Generic]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule E/F]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule D]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule C]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Equity Security Holders (Original or Amended)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule H]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule G]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule A/B]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • March 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • March 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
February, 2025
  • February 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.