U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00511
  • Case Name: CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. DOGE SERVICE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 11, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of QC **DO NOT USE- FOR REPORTING PURPOSES ONLY.**]
  • April 10, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 01, 2025: [Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Discovery]
  • March 26, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 18, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 16, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • March 14, 2025: [Stay]
  • March 12, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 10, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
February, 2025
  • February 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.