U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00069-
  • Case Name: Gregory Brian Myers
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice - Generic]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Final Order by District Court re: Appeal]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Vacate]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Document]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Appellant Designation]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Response]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [13 Chapter 13 Trustee Final Report and Account]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order Dismiss Case]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Receipt re Notice of Appeal]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Dismiss Case Under 11 U.S.C. §§ 521(a),1307(c)(9), or 707(a)(3)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing - Scheduled (by Order) BK]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order To Show Cause]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Complaint]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Dismiss Case]
February, 2025
  • February 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Receipt of Final Installment Payment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.