U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00074
  • Case Name: Lawanda R Jones
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order for Relief]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Relief from Stay]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Certificate of Debtor Education (Original or Amended)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
March, 2025
  • March 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2 (Original or Amended)]
February, 2025
  • February 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.