U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00614
  • Case Name: GORDON COLLEGE v. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • April 11, 2025: [Joint Appendix]
  • April 11, 2025: [Surreply]
  • April 04, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of QC **DO NOT USE- FOR REPORTING PURPOSES ONLY.**]
  • April 01, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
February, 2025
  • February 28, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.