U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00076
  • Case Name: Fateema A Kirk
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Certificate of Debtor Education]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Certificate of Debtor Education (Original or Amended)]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Amended List of Creditors/Schedules: Change EXISTING Name/Address]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Amended List of Creditors/Schedules: Adding, Deleting, Changes to Debt Amount/Reclassification]
  • March 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2 (Original or Amended)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.