U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03603
  • Case Name: ALLIANCE OF LEGAL CANNABIS ENTITIES-DC, LLC v. SMOKE SHOP INC. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines]
  • April 22, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Lift Stay]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Scheduling Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 18, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Lift Stay]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 01, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 31, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Case Stayed]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
  • March 04, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.