U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00070-
  • Case Name: 4069 - 4089 Minnesota Ave, NE, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Opposition]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Convert Case to 7]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Convert Case to 7]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice - Generic]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Generic Motion ]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice - Generic]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Generic (USE ONLY IF NO OTHER EVENT MATCHES)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement Adjourning (Continuing) Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Service - Notice of Filing of Transcript]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [First Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedules A/B-J]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order for Relief]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Transcript]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • March 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Discharge Order to Show Cause (Judge)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice - Generic]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • March 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.