U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00032-
  • Case Name: Burnell Morrissey Smith, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Relief from Stay]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Certificate of Debtor Education (Original or Amended)]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order for Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Hearing - Held (BK)]
March, 2025
  • March 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.