U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00402
  • Case Name: GLOBAL HEALTH COUNCIL et al v. DONALD J. TRUMP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 08, 2025: [Status Report]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 07, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 05, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • May 04, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • May 02, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Status Report]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 29, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 25, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 23, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 22, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 17, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 11, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 11, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 10, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 05, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 03, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 02, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 02, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 19, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 17, 2025: [Status Report Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Leave to File Denied]
  • March 14, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 11, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 10, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 09, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.