U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-02920
  • Case Name: BARTH v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Request for Subpoenas to Issue]
  • April 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Request for Subpoenas to Issue]
  • April 16, 2025: [Request for Subpoenas to Issue]
  • April 16, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Motion For Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.