U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00808
  • Case Name: WOLDERGHAI et al v. WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • May 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Rule 26a2 Statement]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 24, 2025: [Meet and Confer Statement]
  • March 20, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Mediation (Circuit Executive's Office)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Status Report Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Meet and Confer Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.