U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00716
  • Case Name: PERKINS COIE LLP v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • May 02, 2025: [.Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Expedite]
  • April 30, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 30, 2025: [Permanent Injunction]
  • April 30, 2025: [Declaratory Judgment]
  • April 30, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/Party]
  • April 29, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 29, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • April 29, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
  • April 29, 2025: [Extension of Time to Amend ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 28, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 25, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Supplemental Memorandum]
  • April 24, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 23, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Proposed Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 22, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 22, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 18, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 18, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 08, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • April 08, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 08, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 07, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 04, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 04, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 03, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Leave to File Review]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 03, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 03, 2025: [Request for Leave to File Review]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 03, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 02, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 02, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Declaratory Judgment]
  • April 02, 2025: [Permanent Injunction]
  • April 02, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Leave to File Denied]
  • March 26, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Disqualify Judge]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • March 18, 2025: [Clarify]
  • March 18, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 12, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2025: [Errata]
  • March 12, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 12, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 11, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.