U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00527
  • Case Name: PROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC. v. TRUMP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 07, 2025: [Transcript]
  • May 02, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 07, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 11, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • March 11, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • March 11, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.