U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00677
  • Case Name: CENTRO DE TRABAJADORES UNIDOS et al v. BESSENT et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • May 07, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • May 07, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • May 06, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 06, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 05, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • May 01, 2025: [Intervene]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 29, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 29, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • April 28, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Supplemental Memorandum]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 11, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 11, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 11, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 10, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 10, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response to motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Electronic Summons Reissued]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 31, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 30, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • March 27, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 26, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • March 26, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • March 26, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 20, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Courtroom Change]
  • March 18, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • March 14, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 11, 2025: [Status Report Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2025: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.