U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03574
  • Case Name: FORTUNE v. WRIGHT PATMAN CONGRESSIONAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 09, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 05, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • March 24, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2025: [Waiver of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.