U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00715
  • Case Name: DONATELLI v. CAPITAL BANK, N.A.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
  • April 23, 2025: [Meet and Confer Statement]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 17, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • April 16, 2025: [Third Party Complaint]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 16, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 02, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 11, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • March 11, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 11, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.