U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00323-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BIAOU
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 09, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 09, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.